E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/02/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6971
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5092
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5092
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 5041
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6524
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1667
|
Journal Page: 6523
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6516
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4928
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4594
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4593
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4523
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4523
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4523
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5927
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5927
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5927
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5205
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4090
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4090
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4090
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4090
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4090
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4090
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4090
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 4089
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4084
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 4083
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2301
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2301
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3176
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2718
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#649
|
Journal Page: 2717
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2717
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2717
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2669
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2669
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Amended
|
3-Berman
|
Journal Page: 2669
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2665
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Referred to Technology, Economic Development & Workforce
|
|
Journal Page: 571
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 571
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|