E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6027
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6903
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5199
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3311
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3311
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3311
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3311
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3311
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3290
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3311
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Watson
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Postponed
|
3:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3291
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3311
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3290
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3289
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3289
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2564
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2564
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2456
|
House
|
05/17/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3954
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3764
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#903
|
Journal Page: 3764
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3764
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3764
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3636
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3636
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 3635
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3635
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 571
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 571
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|