House | 04/29/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/05/2009 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | ||
House | 03/05/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 571 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Filed |