Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2440
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2440
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2367
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3333
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#803
|
Journal Page: 3333
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3333
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3333
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3288
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Lewis
|
Journal Page: 3288
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3288
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3287
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 571
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 571
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|