House
|
06/01/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6968
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5036
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1105
|
Journal Page: 5032
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4887
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6031
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6031
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4577
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4577
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4523
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4523
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4523
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5908
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5908
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1527
|
Journal Page: 5907
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Motion fails
|
|
Journal Page: 5907
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Motion to instruct conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5907
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5905
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5904
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5904
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5215
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to Government Organization
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2104
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2871
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2582
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#591
|
Journal Page: 2581
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2581
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2581
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2518
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#567
|
Journal Page: 2517
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Eiland
|
Journal Page: 2517
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2517
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 573
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 573
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|