E
|
05/29/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/29/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4640
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2639
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4235
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4236
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1036
|
Journal Page: 4236
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4235
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3950
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2453
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2453
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2453
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2453
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2453
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2453
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2453
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1418
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1872
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1736
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#258
|
Journal Page: 1735
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1735
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1735
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1713
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#247
|
Journal Page: 1712
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1712
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1712
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 573
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 573
|
House
|
02/27/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|