House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1601 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 573 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 573 | |
House | 02/27/2009 | Filed |