E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/31/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4680
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5976
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5128
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2614
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to International Relations and Trade
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1718
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#335
|
Journal Page: 1949
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1949
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1949
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1937
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Hamilton
|
Journal Page: 1937
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1937
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1670
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 574
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 574
|
House
|
02/27/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|