Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2456 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4079 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3763 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#902 | Journal Page: 3763 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3763 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Amendment adopted as amended | 1-Alonzo | Journal Page: 3763 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Amendment amended | 2-Alonzo | Journal Page: 3763 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Alonzo | Journal Page: 3762 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3762 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3635 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3635 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2009 | Referred to Public Safety | Journal Page: 575 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 575 | |
House | 02/27/2009 | Filed |