Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1990 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 1990


 AN ACT
 relating to a diabetes self-management training pilot program under
 the state Medicaid program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0319 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0319.  DIABETES SELF-MANAGEMENT TRAINING PILOT
 PROGRAM. (a)  Notwithstanding Section 32.057, Human Resources
 Code, or Section 533.009 and to the extent allowed by federal law,
 the commission shall establish a pilot program to provide diabetes
 self-management training services to selected Medicaid recipients.
 (b)  The commission may select a person to participate in the
 pilot program if the person is:
 (1)  a recipient of Medicaid under the fee-for-service
 or primary care case management delivery model;
 (2) diagnosed with diabetes; and
 (3)  enrolled in a disease management program available
 to Medicaid recipients.
 (c)  In establishing the pilot program the commission shall
 ensure that:
 (1) either:
 (A)  a provider of diabetes self-management
 training under the program is certified to provide the training in
 accordance with the quality standards for diabetes self-management
 training services described by the Medicare Benefit Policy Manual,
 Chapter 15, Section 300, as effective on January 1, 2009; or
 (B)  a certified diabetes educator is hired to
 provide the training;
 (2)  an assessment of a potential participant in the
 program is conducted that includes a review of the person's medical
 history, risk factors, health status, resource utilization,
 knowledge and skill level, and cultural barriers to effective
 diabetes self-management;
 (3) a participant is offered a minimum of:
 (A)  10 hours of initial self-management training
 with a diabetes educator; and
 (B)  three hours of initial nutrition education
 with a registered dietitian or with a diabetes educator if a
 registered dietitian is not available;
 (4)  after receipt of the initial self-management
 training and nutrition education, the participant is offered each
 year a minimum of:
 (A)  two hours of self-management training with a
 diabetes educator; and
 (B)  two hours of nutrition education with a
 registered dietitian or with a diabetes educator if a registered
 dietitian is not available;
 (5)  if diabetes self-management training is provided
 in group sessions, the participant has direct, face-to-face
 interaction with the diabetes educator and is offered a sufficient
 number of individual sessions to meet the participant's cultural
 and educational needs; and
 (6)  the participant may repeat all or part of the
 self-management training as medically necessary, regardless of
 whether the participant is diagnosed with a new health condition or
 experiences a change in health status.
 (d)  The commission shall ensure that the pilot program
 measures the progress of program participants while enrolled in the
 program using specific health outcomes for diabetes disease
 management.
 (e)  Information collected by the commission during the
 pilot program is confidential and may be disclosed only as
 authorized by this section in a manner that prevents disclosure of
 individually identifiable information.
 (f)  Not later than December 1, 2012, the commission shall
 submit a report to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of
 the house of representatives, standing committees of the
 legislature with appropriate subject matter jurisdiction, and
 Texas Diabetes Council regarding:
 (1)  the data and outcomes that result from the
 diabetes self-management training pilot program; and
 (2)  any other relevant information as determined by
 the commission.
 (g) This section expires September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 2. If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1990 was passed by the House on April
 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1990 was passed by the Senate on May
 13, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: _____________________
 Date
 _____________________
 Governor