Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2003 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2003


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the offense of online harassment.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 33, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Section 33.07 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.07.  ONLINE HARASSMENT. (a) A person commits an
 offense if the person uses the name or persona of another person to
 create a web page on or to post one or more messages on a commercial
 social networking site:
 (1) without obtaining the other person's consent; and
 (2)  with the intent to harm, defraud, intimidate, or
 threaten any person.
 (b)  A person commits an offense if the person sends an
 electronic mail, instant message, text message, or similar
 communication that references a name, domain address, phone number,
 or other item of identifying information belonging to any person:
 (1) without obtaining the other person's consent;
 (2)  with the intent to cause a recipient of the
 communication to reasonably believe that the other person
 authorized or transmitted the communication; and
 (3) with the intent to harm or defraud any person.
 (c)  An offense under Subsection (a) is a felony of the third
 degree.  An offense under Subsection (b) is a Class A misdemeanor,
 except that the offense is a felony of the third degree if the actor
 commits the offense with the intent to solicit a response by
 emergency personnel.
 (d)  If conduct that constitutes an offense under this
 section also constitutes an offense under any other law, the actor
 may be prosecuted under this section, the other law, or both.
 (e)  It is a defense to prosecution under this section that
 the actor is any of the following entities or that the actor's
 conduct consisted solely of action taken as an employee of any of
 the following entities:
 (1) a commercial social networking site;
 (2) an Internet service provider;
 (3)  an interactive computer service, as defined by 47
 U.S.C. Section 230;
 (4)  a telecommunications provider, as defined by
 Section 51.002, Utilities Code; or
 (5)  a video service provider or cable service
 provider, as defined by Section 66.002, Utilities Code.
 (f) In this section:
 (1)  "Commercial social networking site" means any
 business, organization, or other similar entity operating a website
 that permits persons to become registered users for the purpose of
 establishing personal relationships with other users through
 direct or real-time communication with other users or the creation
 of web pages or profiles available to the public or to other users.
 The term does not include an electronic mail program or a message
 board program.
 (2)  "Identifying information" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 32.51.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2003 was passed by the House on May
 13, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 2003 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 2003 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2003 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 23, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 2003 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor