E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4727
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4727
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4133
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5006
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1371
|
Journal Page: 5006
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5002
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3153
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2713
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 2713
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2467
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2467
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2467
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3838
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3838
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 3838
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3298
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2285
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2285
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2285
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2285
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2285
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2285
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2284
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 2283
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2282
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2282
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 944
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1186
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#131
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1132
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1111
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1111
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 588
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 588
|
House
|
02/27/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|