Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2456 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#906 | Journal Page: 3767 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3767 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3767 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3641 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3641 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2434 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 588 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 588 | |
House | 02/27/2009 | Filed |