E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6979 | |
E | 05/31/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6976 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4680 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5976 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6039 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5117 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3172 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3172 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3172 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3172 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3172 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3172 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3172 | |
Senate | 05/26/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2617 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1933 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1933 | |
Senate | 04/20/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1145 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1602 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Record vote | RV#172 | Journal Page: 1282 |
House | 04/17/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1282 | |
House | 04/17/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1282 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1262 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Amended | 1-Burnam | Journal Page: 1262 |
House | 04/16/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1262 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1092 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 589 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 589 | |
House | 02/27/2009 | Filed |