Senate | 05/21/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2685 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2685 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2454 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#896 | Journal Page: 3756 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3756 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3756 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3593 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3593 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 291 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 291 | |
House | 11/12/2008 | Filed |