E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2897
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4640
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2639
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4204
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1030
|
Journal Page: 4205
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4204
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4204
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3951
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2487
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2487
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2487
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2487
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2487
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2487
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2487
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2043
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2043
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2434
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2290
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#496
|
Journal Page: 2289
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2289
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2289
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 2236
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2236
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 590
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 590
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|