Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2064 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2064


 AN ACT
 relating to premium discounts for certain participants in the Texas
 Health Insurance Risk Pool and to funding for those discounts
 through certain penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 843.342, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (m) and (n) to read as follows:
 (m)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section,
 this subsection governs the payment of a penalty under this
 section.  For a penalty under this section relating to a clean claim
 submitted by a physician or provider other than an institutional
 provider, the health maintenance organization shall pay the entire
 penalty to the physician or provider, except for any interest
 computed under Subsection (c), which shall be paid to the Texas
 Health Insurance Risk Pool.  For a penalty under this section
 relating to a clean claim submitted by an institutional provider,
 the health maintenance organization shall pay 50 percent of the
 total penalty amount computed under this section, including
 interest, to the institutional provider and the remaining 50
 percent of that amount to the Texas Health Insurance Risk Pool.
 (n)  In this section, "institutional provider" means a
 hospital or other medical or health-related service facility that
 provides care for the sick or injured or other care that may be
 covered in an evidence of coverage.
 SECTION 2. Section 1301.137, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (l) to read as follows:
 (l)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section,
 this subsection governs the payment of a penalty under this
 section.  For a penalty under this section relating to a clean claim
 submitted by a preferred provider other than an institutional
 provider, the insurer shall pay the entire penalty to the preferred
 provider, except for any interest computed under Subsection (c),
 which shall be paid to the Texas Health Insurance Risk Pool.  For a
 penalty under this section relating to a clean claim submitted by an
 institutional provider, the insurer shall pay 50 percent of the
 penalty amount computed under this section, including interest, to
 the institutional provider and the remaining 50 percent of that
 amount to the Texas Health Insurance Risk Pool.
 SECTION 3. Section 1506.105, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (e-1) to read as
 follows:
 (e) Premium rates shall be established to provide fully for
 all of the expected costs of claims, including recovery of prior
 losses, expenses of operation, investment income from claim
 reserves, and any other cost factors, subject to the limitations
 [limitation] described in this subsection and Subsection (e-1). In
 no event may pool premium rates exceed 200 percent of the standard
 risk rate described by Subsection (d) [rates applicable to
 individual standard risks].
 (e-1)  Subject to the availability of funds under Section
 1506.260, discounted premiums shall be offered on a sliding scale,
 based on financial need, as follows:
 (1)  for an individual whose household income is below
 200 percent of the federal poverty measure, determined under the
 United States Department of Health and Human Services poverty
 guidelines in effect at the time coverage is provided, premium
 rates shall equal the standard risk rate described by Subsection
 (d); and
 (2)  for an individual whose household income is at or
 below 300 percent, but not less than 200 percent, of the federal
 poverty measure, determined under the United States Department of
 Health and Human Services poverty guidelines in effect at the time
 coverage is provided, premium rates shall equal 140 percent of the
 standard risk rate described by Subsection (d).
 SECTION 4. Subchapter F, Chapter 1506, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1506.260 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1506.260.  FUNDING FOR PREMIUM DISCOUNTS.  The board
 shall collect penalty payments and interest paid by health
 maintenance organizations as provided by Section 843.342 and
 insurers as provided by Section 1301.137. The board may use funds
 collected under this section only to finance premium discounts
 under Section 1506.105(e-1).  The board may require a health
 maintenance organization or an insurer to make payments under this
 section and make reports concerning those payments in a manner
 determined by the board.
 SECTION 5. (a) Sections 843.342 and 1301.137, Insurance
 Code, as amended by this Act, apply only to a penalty or interest on
 a penalty owed with respect to a clean claim paid on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A penalty or interest on a penalty owed
 with respect to a clean claim paid before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law in effect immediately before that date,
 and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b) This Act applies only to premium rates for coverage
 through the Texas Health Insurance Risk Pool under Chapter 1506,
 Insurance Code, as amended by this Act, that is in effect on or
 after January 1, 2011. Premium rates for coverage in effect before
 January 1, 2011, are governed by the law in effect immediately
 before the effective date of this Act, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect January 1, 2010.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2064 was passed by the House on April
 8, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2064 on May 18, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2064 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor