E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/28/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5986
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3911
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5114
|
House
|
05/26/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5163
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4736
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4737
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1139
|
Journal Page: 4736
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4736
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4306
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2627
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2394
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1658
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2010
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#286
|
Journal Page: 1820
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1820
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Gallego
|
Journal Page: 1820
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1820
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Postponed
|
4/24/09 1:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 1795
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1747
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#263
|
Journal Page: 1747
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1747
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
2-Giddings
|
Journal Page: 1746
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
1-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 1744
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1744
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1123
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 590
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 590
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|