House | 04/24/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1861 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Record vote | RV#327 | Journal Page: 1861 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 1861 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Point of order sustained (amendment) | Rule 11, Section 2 | Journal Page: 1861 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | 2-Aycock | Journal Page: 1860 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1860 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Postponed | 4/24/09 2:30 PM | Journal Page: 1822 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Amendment withdrawn | 1-Aycock | Journal Page: 1797 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) | Rule 11, Section 2 | Journal Page: 1797 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1797 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1236 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Public Safety | Journal Page: 291 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 291 | |
House | 11/12/2008 | Filed |