House | 05/02/2009 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 2336 | |
House | 04/29/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2135 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 592 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 592 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Filed |