Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2093 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2093


 AN ACT
 relating to persons certified as peace officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1701.404, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.404. CERTIFICATION OF OFFICERS FOR MENTAL HEALTH
 ASSIGNMENTS. (a) The commission by rule may establish minimum
 requirements for the training, testing, and certification of
 special officers for offenders with mental impairments.
 (b) The commission may certify a sheriff, sheriff's deputy,
 constable, [or] other peace officer, county jailer, or [a] justice
 of the peace[,] as a special officer for offenders with mental
 impairments if the person [officer]:
 (1) completes a training course in emergency first aid
 and lifesaving techniques approved by the commission;
 (2) completes a training course administered by the
 commission on mental health issues and offenders with mental
 impairments; and
 (3) passes an examination administered by the
 commission that is designed to test the person's [officer's]:
 (A) knowledge and recognition of the
 characteristics and symptoms of mental illness, mental
 retardation, and mental disabilities; and
 (B) knowledge of mental health crisis
 intervention strategies for people with mental impairments.
 (c) The commission may issue a professional achievement or
 proficiency certificate to an officer, county jailer, or justice of
 the peace who meets the requirements of Subsection (b).
 SECTION 2. (a) The Commission on Law Enforcement Officer
 Standards and Education may certify a county jailer as a special
 officer for offenders with mental impairments and may issue a
 certificate to the county jailer if the county jailer meets the
 requirements of Section 1701.404(b), Occupations Code, as amended
 by this Act, regardless of whether the county jailer completed the
 required training and passed the examination before, on, or after
 the effective date of this Act.
 (b) The Commission on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and
 Education may issue a certificate under Section 1701.404(c),
 Occupations Code, as amended by this Act, to a justice of the peace
 who is certified as a special officer for offenders with mental
 impairments regardless of whether the justice of the peace was
 certified before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2093 was passed by the House on May
 11, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 2093 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 2093 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2093 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 2093 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor