Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2097 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hodge, Madden (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 2097
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Government Organization; May 23, 2009, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; May 23, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2097 By: Hegar


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the personal and official use of state vehicles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 2113.013, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (b-1), (d), (e), (f), (g), (h), and (i) to read
 as follows:
 (b-1)  An officer or employee of a state agency who is
 authorized to use a state-owned or state-leased motor vehicle under
 Subsection (b) shall reimburse the state for the officer's or
 employee's personal use mileage accumulated on the vehicle,
 including mileage resulting from commuting to and from the
 officer's or employee's residence.  The officer or employee must
 submit the reimbursement to the state agency not later than the 60th
 day after the last day of the month in which the officer or employee
 accumulates personal use mileage.
 (d)  The comptroller shall establish guidelines for a state
 agency officer or employee who is authorized to use a state-owned or
 state-leased motor vehicle under Subsection (b) to reimburse the
 state for the officer's or employee's personal use of the vehicle at
 the state mileage reimbursement rate established as provided by
 Section 660.042. The guidelines must include:
 (1)  standards for submission of personal use
 information to the state agency;
 (2)  a requirement that the officer or employee
 maintain a point-by-point mileage log for the vehicle, except as
 provided by Subsection (h); and
 (3)  procedures for the officer or employee to follow
 to reimburse the state for the officer's or employee's personal use
 of the vehicle.
 (e)  Except as provided by Subsection (h), a state agency
 that authorizes a state agency officer or employee to use a
 state-owned or state-leased motor vehicle under Subsection (b)
 shall adopt the guidelines established by the comptroller under
 Subsection (d).
 (f)  Not later than December 31 of each year, the comptroller
 shall submit a report to the presiding officers of both houses of
 the legislature on the personal use of state-owned or state-leased
 motor vehicles by state agency officers and employees.  The report
 must include:
 (1)  the total personal use miles attributable to each
 state agency; and
 (2)  an accounting of reimbursements made to a state
 agency under Subsection (b-1).
 (g)  The comptroller may require the installation of global
 positioning devices in all motor vehicles purchased or leased by
 the state.  The comptroller shall modify the guidelines established
 under Subsection (d) as necessary to make use of the devices.
 (h)  A peace officer or other law enforcement officer who is
 authorized to use a state-owned or state-leased motor vehicle under
 Subsection (b) and whose primary duty is to patrol an established
 area is not required to log personal use mileage. A state agency
 officer or employee who is authorized to use a state-owned or
 state-leased motor vehicle under Subsection (b) and who performs
 functions vital to law enforcement or public safety as determined
 by the administrative head of the agency is not required to log
 personal use mileage or to reimburse the state under Subsection
 (b-1).
 (i)  Subsection (b-1) does not apply to an individual who has
 been commissioned as:
 (1)  a peace officer by the Public Safety Commission or
 the director of the Department of Public Safety;
 (2)  a peace officer by the executive director of the
 Parks and Wildlife Department;
 (3)  an inspector or representative by the Texas
 Alcoholic Beverage Commission or the administrator of the Texas
 Alcoholic Beverage Commission; or
 (4)  an employee of the office of the attorney general
 who is assigned to a division that involves law enforcement.
 SECTION 2. Section 2203.001, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsections (c-1) and (c-2) to
 read as follows:
 (c) A report filed under this section must show:
 (1) the purpose for which the vehicle was used;
 (2) the mileage traveled, including a detailed
 point-by-point accounting of the mileage between stops and the
 purpose for each stop except as provided  by Section 2113.013(h);
 (3) the amounts of gasoline and oil consumed;
 (4) the passengers carried; and
 (5) other information necessary to a proper record of
 the use of the vehicle.
 (c-1)  A state agency that uses state-owned or state-leased
 vehicles for undercover or security purposes may develop a
 code-based system to identify locations for the purposes of this
 section.
 (c-2)  An individual described by Section 2113.013(i) is not
 required to include in a report filed under this section a detailed
 point-by-point accounting of the mileage between stops and the
 purpose for each stop.
 SECTION 3. The comptroller shall adopt the guidelines
 required by Section 2113.013(d), Government Code, as added by this
 Act, as soon as possible. The guidelines must take effect not later
 than September 1, 2009, and apply to a state agency on or after
 September 1, 2009.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *