Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2394
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1933
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1930
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1837
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#297
|
Journal Page: 1837
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1837
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1836
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1806
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1806
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1806
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1148
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|