House
|
05/07/2009
|
Motion to concur in Senate amdmts. withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2763
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 11, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 2763
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Motion to concur in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2763
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2432
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1983
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1983
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1983
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1983
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1983
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1983
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1983
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Lucio
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1982
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1968
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Motion to suspend regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1968
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1415
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#144
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1166
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1166
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 593
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|