E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6899
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4997
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6117
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6112
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4841
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6031
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6031
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4576
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4576
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4523
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4523
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4523
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5721
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5721
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5721
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5200
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Shapiro
|
Journal Page: 3344
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3344
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3344
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2715
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2312
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3441
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#749
|
Journal Page: 3215
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3215
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3215
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3188
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3188
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2336
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 612
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 612
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|