E
|
06/16/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4520
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5746
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5746
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1497
|
Journal Page: 5746
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5746
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5200
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3524
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3416
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3416
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3416
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3416
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3416
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3416
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 3415
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 3415
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3415
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3415
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3188
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3166
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 2564
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2564
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2398
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3349
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#816
|
Journal Page: 3348
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3348
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3348
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/13/09 12:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3314
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 8, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 3314
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3314
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3258
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#780
|
Journal Page: 3257
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3257
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Amended
|
6-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 3256
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
8-Geren
|
Journal Page: 3256
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Article III, Section 30
|
Journal Page: 3255
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
6-S. Turner
|
Journal Page: 3253
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2 and Rule 11, Section 3; Article III, Section 30
|
Journal Page: 3252
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3249
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/12/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3158
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3157
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/11/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3016
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3015
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
4-Chisum
|
Journal Page: 3014
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3012
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Gonzales
|
Journal Page: 3005
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Motion to table withdrawn
|
2-Gonzales
|
Journal Page: 3005
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3004
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2009
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 597
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|