1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 2163 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to a study regarding the provision of certain medications |
---|
6 | 6 | | through the Medicaid vendor drug program to children younger than |
---|
7 | 7 | | 16 years of age. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is |
---|
10 | 10 | | amended by adding Section 531.0731 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 531.0731. STUDY REGARDING THE PROVISION OF CERTAIN |
---|
12 | 12 | | MEDICATION TO CHILDREN. (a) The commission shall conduct a study |
---|
13 | 13 | | to determine the appropriateness and safety of providing |
---|
14 | 14 | | antipsychotic or neuroleptic medication through the Medicaid |
---|
15 | 15 | | vendor drug program to children younger than 16 years of age. |
---|
16 | 16 | | (b) The study conducted under Subsection (a) must consider |
---|
17 | 17 | | the following factors relevant to the appropriateness and safety of |
---|
18 | 18 | | providing the medications to children: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (1) the physical and psychological medical diagnosis |
---|
20 | 20 | | of a child's condition; |
---|
21 | 21 | | (2) whether the United States Food and Drug |
---|
22 | 22 | | Administration has approved a medication for use by a child of a |
---|
23 | 23 | | certain age; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (3) whether a child has successfully taken a |
---|
25 | 25 | | medication previously; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (4) access to quality medical care for a child |
---|
27 | 27 | | receiving benefits under the program; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (5) the standard of care in the medical profession |
---|
29 | 29 | | regarding the provision of such medications to a child; and |
---|
30 | 30 | | (6) any other factor the commission considers |
---|
31 | 31 | | relevant. |
---|
32 | 32 | | (c) Not later than November 10, 2010, the executive |
---|
33 | 33 | | commissioner shall submit a report containing the results of the |
---|
34 | 34 | | study conducted under Subsection (a) to the governor, the |
---|
35 | 35 | | lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, |
---|
36 | 36 | | and the chairs of the Senate Committee on Health and Human Services |
---|
37 | 37 | | and the House Committee on Public Health. |
---|
38 | 38 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
39 | 39 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
40 | 40 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
41 | 41 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2163 was passed by the House on May |
---|
42 | 42 | | 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 4, 1 present, not |
---|
43 | 43 | | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
44 | 44 | | H.B. No. 2163 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
45 | 45 | | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
46 | 46 | | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
47 | 47 | | on H.B. No. 2163 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 147, |
---|
48 | 48 | | Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
49 | 49 | | ______________________________ |
---|
50 | 50 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
51 | 51 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2163 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
52 | 52 | | amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
53 | 53 | | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
54 | 54 | | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
55 | 55 | | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
56 | 56 | | 2163 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
57 | 57 | | ______________________________ |
---|
58 | 58 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
59 | 59 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
60 | 60 | | Date |
---|
61 | 61 | | __________________ |
---|
62 | 62 | | Governor |
---|