House | 05/04/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2414 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 95 | Journal Page: 2414 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Postponed | 5/4/09 2:00 PM | Journal Page: 1813 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1813 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 292 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 292 | |
House | 11/13/2008 | Filed |