House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1186 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 598 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 598 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Filed |