Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2186 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 2186
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2009;
 May 1, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 11, 2009, reported
 favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 11, 2009, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the payment of a vehicle registration fee by a check
 drawn against insufficient funds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 502.181(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) A county assessor-collector who receives from any
 person a check or draft drawn on a bank or trust company in payment
 of a registration fee for a registration year that has not ended on
 a motor vehicle, trailer, or motorcycle sidecar that is returned
 unpaid because of insufficient funds or no funds in the bank or
 trust company to the credit of the drawer of the check or draft
 shall [immediately] certify the fact to the sheriff or a constable
 or highway patrol officer in the county after attempts to contact
 the person fail to result in the collection of payment. The
 certification must be made before the 30th day after the date the
 check or draft is returned unpaid and:
 (1) be under the assessor-collector's official seal;
 (2) include the name and address of the person who gave
 the assessor-collector the check or draft;
 (3) include the license plate number and make of the
 vehicle; [and]
 (4) be accompanied by the check or draft; and
 (5)  be accompanied by documentation of any attempt to
 contact the person and collect payment.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a payment of a registration fee submitted to a county
 assessor-collector on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 payment submitted before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect on the date the payment was submitted, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *