Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2194 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R8818 TRH-D
 By: Christian H.B. No. 2194


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the goal of installing additional capacity for
 generating renewable energy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Sections 39.904(a) and (c), Utilities Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) It is the intent of the legislature that by January 1,
 2015, an additional 5,000 megawatts of generating capacity from
 renewable energy technologies will have been installed in this
 state. The cumulative installed renewable capacity in this state
 shall total 5,880 megawatts by January 1, 2015, and the commission
 shall establish a target of 10,000 megawatts of installed renewable
 capacity by January 1, 2025. The cumulative installed renewable
 capacity in this state shall total [2,280 megawatts by January 1,
 2007, 3,272 megawatts by January 1, 2009,] 4,264 megawatts by
 January 1, 2011, 5,256 megawatts by January 1, 2013, and 5,880
 megawatts by January 1, 2015. Of the cumulative renewable energy
 technology generating capacity installed to meet the goal of this
 subsection after September 1, 2009 [2005], a total of [the
 commission shall establish a target of having] at least 500
 megawatts of capacity from [a] renewable energy technologies
 [technology] other than [a source using] wind energy technologies
 shall be installed by January 1, 2017.
 (c) The [Not later than January 1, 2000, the] commission
 shall adopt rules necessary to administer and enforce this section.
 At a minimum, the rules shall:
 (1) establish the minimum annual renewable energy
 requirement, including a minimum annual requirement for the
 installation of generating capacity from renewable energy
 technologies other than wind energy technologies, for each retail
 electric provider, municipally owned utility, and electric
 cooperative operating in this state in a manner reasonably
 calculated by the commission to produce, on a statewide basis,
 compliance with the requirement prescribed by Subsection (a); and
 (2) specify reasonable performance standards that all
 renewable capacity additions must meet to count against the
 requirement prescribed by Subsection (a) and that:
 (A) are designed and operated so as to maximize
 the energy output from the capacity additions in accordance with
 then-current industry standards; and
 (B) encourage the development, construction, and
 operation of new renewable energy projects at those sites in this
 state that have the greatest economic potential for capture and
 development of this state's environmentally beneficial renewable
 resources.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.