Senate | 04/27/2009 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1658 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1658 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1630 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2010 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1830 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Record vote | RV#288 | Journal Page: 1830 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1830 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1830 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1828 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1799 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Amended | 1-Bolton | Journal Page: 1799 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1798 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1601 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 600 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 600 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Filed |