House
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3041
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 601
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 601
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|