House | 05/02/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2332 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1442 | Journal Page: 2331 |
House | 05/02/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1034 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/13/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/13/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 603 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 603 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Filed |