E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/31/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4680
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5976
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3173
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3173
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3173
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3173
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3173
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3173
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3173
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2302
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2198
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2980
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#676
|
Journal Page: 2979
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2979
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2979
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2728
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2728
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 604
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 604
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|