E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2897
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4640
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2639
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4206
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1031
|
Journal Page: 4207
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4206
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3950
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2476
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2476
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2476
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2476
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
CA2 Duncan
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2475
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2358
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1758
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#390
|
Journal Page: 2015
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2015
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2015
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1998
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1997
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#387
|
Journal Page: 1997
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
2-Gallego
|
Journal Page: 1997
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 1996
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-Gallego
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Postponed
|
4/28/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Gallego
|
Journal Page: 1916
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 1916
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Gallego
|
Journal Page: 1914
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1907
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 605
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|