Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2715
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 2564
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2564
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2457
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3770
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#909
|
Journal Page: 3770
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3770
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Hodge
|
Journal Page: 3769
|
House
|
05/15/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3769
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3643
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3643
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3643
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 606
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 606
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|