E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2913
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4818
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4362
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1066
|
Journal Page: 4362
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4362
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4075
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2394
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1880
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2300
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2183
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#423
|
Journal Page: 2183
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2183
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2183
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2116
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Amended
|
2-Herrero
|
Journal Page: 2116
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2116
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1275
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 607
|
House
|
03/03/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|