Senate | 05/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 2390 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2390 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2312 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3441 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3216 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | RV#749 | Journal Page: 3216 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3216 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3216 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3188 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3188 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Filed |