Senate | 05/22/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2756 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 2390 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2390 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2310 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3679 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | RV#749 | Journal Page: 3214 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3214 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3214 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3184 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Amended | 1-Hancock | Journal Page: 3185 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3184 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2870 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Reported favorably as amended | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 293 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 293 | |
House | 11/14/2008 | Filed |