E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6979 | |
E | 06/01/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6976 | |
Senate | 05/31/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4986 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6027 | |
House | 05/30/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6903 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5205 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3931 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3931 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3931 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3931 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3931 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3931 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 3930 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 3165 | |
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 2223 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2223 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2198 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3302 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2977 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Record vote | RV#674 | Journal Page: 2977 |
House | 05/08/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2977 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2977 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2727 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Record vote | RV#653 | Journal Page: 2726 |
House | 05/07/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2726 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Amended | 1-Gattis | Journal Page: 2725 |
House | 05/07/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2725 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Postponed | 5/7/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2649 |
House | 05/06/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2649 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Filed |