E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6897
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6171
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4505
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2713
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 2713
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2400
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2400
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2400
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3446
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3446
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 3446
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2671
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2085
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2085
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2085
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2085
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2085
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2085
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2084
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Whitmire
|
Journal Page: 2076
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2076
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2076
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2003
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1610
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#144
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1167
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1167
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 623
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 623
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|