E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/25/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4569
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2572
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4084
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4085
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#981
|
Journal Page: 4084
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4084
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3438
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2326
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2326
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2326
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2326
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2326
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2326
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2326
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2225
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1974
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#363
|
Journal Page: 1973
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1973
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Amended
|
2-C. Howard
|
Journal Page: 1972
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1972
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1908
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Amended
|
3-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 1908
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1908
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1602
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 623
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 623
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|