E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6979 | |
E | 05/25/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4992 | |
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 05/23/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4569 | |
House | 05/23/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4641 | |
House | 05/20/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4217 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2591 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2591 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2591 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2591 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2591 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2591 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2590 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1933 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1933 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1631 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1930 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1790 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Record vote | RV#282 | Journal Page: 1789 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1789 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1789 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1755 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1755 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Postponed | Journal Page: 1751 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1751 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1148 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 623 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 623 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Filed |