Senate | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1931 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1931 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1374 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1772 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1692 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Record vote | RV#228 | Journal Page: 1692 |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1692 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1692 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1628 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1628 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Amendment withdrawn | 3-Isett | Journal Page: 1628 |
House | 04/21/2009 | Record vote | RV#219 | Journal Page: 1627 |
House | 04/21/2009 | Amended | 2-P. King | Journal Page: 1627 |
House | 04/21/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1626 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1625 | |
House | 04/21/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/03/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1092 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 293 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 293 | |
House | 11/14/2008 | Filed |