Senate | 05/12/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 2302 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2302 | |
Senate | 04/16/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1068 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1276 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#151 | Journal Page: 1223 |
House | 04/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1223 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1223 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1215 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1215 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 989 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 624 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 624 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Filed |