Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2328 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2328


 AN ACT
 relating to the punishment for certain fraud offenses committed
 against elderly individuals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 32.21, Penal Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (c) and adding Subsection (e-1) to read as
 follows:
 (c) Except as provided by [in] Subsections (d), [and] (e),
 and (e-1), an offense under this section is a Class A misdemeanor.
 (e-1)  An offense under this section is increased to the next
 higher category of offense if it is shown on the trial of the
 offense that the offense was committed against an elderly
 individual as defined by Section 22.04.
 SECTION 2. Section 32.31(d), Penal Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (d) An offense under this section is a state jail felony,
 except that the offense is a felony of the third degree if it is
 shown on the trial of the offense that the offense was committed
 against an elderly individual as defined by Section 22.04.
 SECTION 3. Section 32.51, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  An offense described for purposes of punishment by
 Subsections (c)(1)-(3) is increased to the next higher category of
 offense if it is shown on the trial of the offense that the offense
 was committed against an elderly individual as defined by Section
 22.04.
 SECTION 4. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For the
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2328 was passed by the House on April
 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 131, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 2328 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 2328 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2328 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 2328 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor