House | 05/13/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2009 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 293 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 293 | |
House | 11/14/2008 | Filed |