E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6895
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4422
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5319
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5320
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1413
|
Journal Page: 5319
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5319
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5129
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 2223
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2223
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2198
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2996
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#692
|
Journal Page: 2995
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2995
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2995
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2763
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2763
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Farias
|
Journal Page: 2762
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2762
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1569
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 627
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 627
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|