House | 04/23/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1751 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 346 | Journal Page: 1751 |
House | 04/23/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1014 | |
House | 03/24/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 628 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 628 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Filed |